Elusen gysylltiedig 1146710-2 THE TEMPLE BALSALL AMALGAMATED CHARITIES
Dogfen lywodraethu
SCHEME DATED 10 JUN 1888 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 10 JUL 1888 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 25 MAR 1891 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 19 APR 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO RELIEVE THOSE IN FINANCIAL NEED, THE ELDERLY AND THOSE IN POOR HEALTH BY PROVIDING ACCOMMODATION SERVICES OR FACILITIES TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PERSONS
Maes buddion
PARISH OF TEMPLE BALSALL (AS CONSTITUTED ON 10 JULY 1888)
Hanes cofrestru