Trustees THE INSTITUTE OF BREWING & DISTILLING
Charity number: 269830
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bhavya Mandanna | Chair | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Raphael Grisoni | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Cook | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Megan Sheehy | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
George William Calvert | Trustee | 09 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Nadine Edbertine Stelma | Trustee | 09 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Geoffrey Price | Trustee | 06 November 2018 |
|
|||||
David Andrew Smith | Trustee | 06 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Douglas Murray | Trustee | 19 September 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.