Dogfen lywodraethu THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF MACINTYRE TALL TREES
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
RULES ADOPTED 15TH AUGUST 1990 AS AMENDED 25TH APRIL 1991, AND FURTHER AMENDED 26 JANUARY 1993 AND 22 FEBRUARY 1994. AS AMENDED 10 FEBRUARY 1997
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO RELIEVE RESIDENTS OF TALL TREES WHO ARE DISABLED OR IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE AND GENERALLY TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF TALL TREES;(A)TO MOBILISE,ENCOURAGE,FOSTER AND MAINTAIN THE INTEREST AND SUPPORT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SAID TALL TREES;(B)TO RAISE FUNDS AND TO INVITE AND RECEIVE CONTRIBUTIONS FROM ANY PERSON OR PERSONS OR ORGANISATIONS WHATSOEVER BY WAY OF SUBSCRIPTION,DONATION OR OTHERWISE;PROVIDED THAT THE ASSOCIATION SHALL NOT UNDERTAKE PERMANENT TRADING ACTIVITIES IN RAISING FUNDS FOR THE SAID OBJECTS;(C)TO SUPPLEMENT THE SERVICE PROVIDED BY TALL TREES FOR THE HEALTH,WELFARE AND COMFORT OF THE RESIDENTS OF TALL TREES;(D)TO UNDERTAKE AND EXECUTE ANY CHARITABLE TRUST;(E)TO DO ALL SUCH OTHER LAWFUL THINGS AS ARE NECESSARY FOR THE ATTAINMENT OF THE ABOVE OBJECT.
Maes buddion
SHIPTON-UNDER-WYCHWOOD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.