Dogfen lywodraethu THE DAVID LEWIS CENTRE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 SEPTEMBER 1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 4 FEBRUARY 1993, 1 MAY 1997, 12 NOVEMBER 2004 AND 17 APRIL 2009. CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 25 JANUARY 1999
Gwrthrychau elusennol
3.1 THE RELIEF OF THOSE WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF MENTAL OR PHYSICAL DISABILITIES, INCLUDING EPILEPSY AND ASSOCIATED NEUROLOGICAL CONDITIONS ("THE BENEFICIARIES") IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION BY PROVIDING: = TEMPORARY OR PERMANENT ACCOMMODATION = EDUCATION, TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES = MEDICAL OR CLINICAL TREATMENT = SOCIAL AND WELFARE ACTIVITIES FOR THE PURPOSE OF IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE BENEFICIARIES 3.2 THE PRESERVATION AND PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH BY CONDUCTING OR SUPPORTING STUDY AND RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES AND TREATMENT OF THE BENEFICIARIES' DISABILITIES AND CONDITIONS AND PUBLISHING AND DISSEMINATING THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.