Dogfen lywodraethu THE METCALFE SOCIETY
Rhif yr elusen: 1000879
Cyfredol
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 08/10/1988 AS AMENDED ON 13/10/1990 AS AMENDED ON 03/10/2015 as amended on 05 Oct 2019 as amended on 03 Oct 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A) TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE THE PUBLIC STUDY OF FAMILY AND LOCAL HISTORY, GENEALOGY, HERALDRY AND DEMOGRAPHY WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE NAME "METCALFE" ( AND ITS VARIANTS) B) TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION, SECURITY AND ACCESSABILITY OF ARCHIVAL MATERIAL IN RELATION TO THE ABOVE MENTIONED OBJECTS
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.