Elusennau cysylltiedig WALDEN SCHOOL
Rhif yr elusen: 1000981
Elusen a dynnwyd
Elusennau cysylltiedig
Dogfen lywodraethu
INDENTURE DATED 13 AUGUST 1877 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL TRUST DEEDS DATED 5 OCTOBER 1994 AND 30 MARCH 2000, AND AN ORDER OF THE COMMISSIONERS DATED 9 APRIL 2003.
AS AMENDED ON 18 NOV 2002
Gwrthrychau elusennol
SEE SCHEDULE OF ORDER DATED 9 APRIL 2003.
Maes buddion
SAFFRON WALDEN, ESSEX
Hanes cofrestru
- 19 Mai 2003 : Cofrestrwyd
- 07 Medi 2023 : Tynnwyd
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.