Dogfen lywodraethu TTE TECHNICAL INSTITUTE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13/03/1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/11/1990 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 03/08/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/01/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/02/2014 as amended on 28 Jan 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION TRAINING AND LEARNING AND IN PARTICULAR THE RAISING OF THE STANDARDS OF TECHNICAL PRODUCTION ADMINISTRATIVE AND MANAGEMENT SKILLS AND TECHNIQUES IN INDUSTRY AND COMMERCE
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.