Dogfen lywodraethu IRAN HERITAGE FOUNDATION

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM & ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 JUNE 1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION PASSED 21 AUGUST 1990, 7 NOVEMBER 1996, 19 JULY 1998 AND 25 NOVEMBER 2009
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY IN THE LANGUAGES, LITERATURE,HISTORY, RELIGION,PHILOSOPHIES,ARTS AND CULTURES OF IRAN BY PROMOTING AND ENCOURAGING RESEARCH,THE PUBLICATION AND DISTRIBUTION OF BOOKS AND PUBLICATIONS OF SCHOLARLY AND ARTISTIC MERIT AND BY OTHER ACTIVITIES OF SCHOLARLY AND ARTISTIC MERIT
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.