Dogfen lywodraethu THE CHINESE NATIONAL HEALTHY LIVING CENTRE
Rhif yr elusen: 1002158
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 MARCH 1989 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED ON 29 SEPTEMBER 1990 AND 21 JANUARY 1991 AND AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION PASSED ON 23 JUNE 1998 AND 4TH OCTOBER 2000
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH OF CHINESE PEOPLE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
UNITED KINGDOM
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.