Dogfen lywodraethu THE MAYFIELD TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26/11/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/11/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/12/2007 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 16/05/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 26/04/2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF LIFE FOR CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE, ADULTS AND OLDER PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES AND/OR A MENTAL ILLNESS, AND TO PROVIDE INFORMATION, ADVICE AND SUPPORT FOR THEIR PARENTS, RELATIVES AND CARERS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.