Dogfen lywodraethu THE NAUTICAL INSTITUTE
Rhif yr elusen: 1002462

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/12/1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31/05/2013 as amended on 12 May 2019 as amended on 05 Dec 2019 as amended on 29 Jun 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE STUDY OF NAUTICAL SCIENCE AND SUBJECT THERETO NAUTICAL STUDIES GENERALLY
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.