Dogfen lywodraethu HINDU CULTURAL ASSOCIATION (WALES)
Rhif yr elusen: 1002569

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 MAR 1991 AS AMENDED ON 17 JUN 2001 AS AMENDED ON 30 MAY 2006 AS AMENDED ON 19 MAY 2009 AS AMENDED ON 13 JUN 2016 AS AMENDED ON 23 JUL 2017 as amended on 10 Jun 2018 as amended on 20 Sep 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(1) TO ADVANCE THE UNDERSTANDING AND AWARENESS OF HINDU RELIGION AND PHILOSOPHY (2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION (3) TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS AMONGST THE HINDU COMMUNITY RESIDENT IN WALES
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
WALES
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.