Dogfen lywodraethu THE KING'S CHURCH (HORSHAM)
Rhif yr elusen: 1002821
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 1ST OCTOBER 1990, AMENDED BY DEEDS OF VARIATION DATED 22ND APRIL 1991, 29TH OCTOBER 1993, 19TH MARCH 1994 AND SCHEME OF 18TH NOVEMBER 1997.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND PURSUE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.