Dogfen lywodraethu AXIS WEB

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 MARCH 1991 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 17 APRIL 2003, 25 DECEMBER 2004 AND 30 NOVEMBER 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 DEC 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08 APR 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTING AND DEVELOPING THE UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF THE VISUAL ARTS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM IN PARTICULAR BY EXTENDING THE INFLUENCE IN AND RELEVANCE OF THE VISUAL ARTS TO THE COMMUNITY, BY CREATING NEW OPPORTUNITIES IN THE VISUAL ARTS AND BY ENCOURAGING AND FACILITATING AN INCREASE IN GOOD PRACTICE IN THE VISUAL ARTS.
Maes buddion
UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.