Dogfen lywodraethu EDUCATION ACTION
Rhif yr elusen: 1003323
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 DECEMBER 1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 5 FEBRUARY 1994, 18 JUNE 1996 AND 3 JULY 2008, AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION UPON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 18 MARCH 2008
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY. B. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.