Dogfen lywodraethu ULCEBY PRE-SCHOOL & OUT OF SCHOOL CLUB
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 03/03/1982 AS AMENDED ON 04/01/1996 AS AMENDED ON 30/03/2006 AS AMENDED ON 22/10/2009 AS AMENDED ON 04/05/2011 AS AMENDED ON 22 NOV 2017 as amended on 02 Sep 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: (A)OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES, FAMILY LEARNING AND EXTENDED HOURS GROUPS, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY; (B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN LOCAL AREAS; (C) INSTIGATING AND AHERING TO AND FURTHER THE AIMS AND OBJECTIVES OF THE PRE_SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.