Dogfen lywodraethu FELIX CAT RESCUE
Rhif yr elusen: 1003930
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25TH JULY 1991 AS AMENDED 16TH MARCH 1993, 22ND JUNE 1993 AND AGM 16 JUNE 1994. as amended on 27 Apr 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(1) FOR THE CARE AND PROTECTION OF CATS AND KITTENS IN NEED OF CARE AND PROTECTION BY REASON OF BEING STRAY, NEGLECTED OR UNWANTED AND TO PREVENT CRUELTY AND SUFFERING TO CATS AND KITTENS; AND (11)FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE PROPER CARE OF CATS AND KITTENS.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.