Dogfen lywodraethu FRIENDS OF ST WILFRID'S SCHOOL - HAYWARDS HEATH

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 SEPTEMBER 1991, AS AMENDED 27 SEPTEMBER 1995 AND 28 FEBRUARY 2007. AS AMENDED ON 23/01/2015 AS AMENDED ON 24 MAR 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Maes buddion
ST. WILFRID'S C OF E PRIMARY SCHOOL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.