Dogfen lywodraethu THE PRIVATE PHYSIOTHERAPY EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 OCTOBER 1991 AS AMENDED 24 JUNE 1997, 11 MARCH 2002 AND 23 APRIL 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01 APR 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE FIELD OF PHYSIOTHERAPY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR BY: (1) THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN PHYSIOTHERAPY TO THE PUBLIC AT LARGE AND IN PARTICULAR: (A) TO PHYSIOTHERAPY PATIENTS TO ENABLE SUCH PATIENTS TO RELIEVE OR ASSIST IN RELIEVING THEIR OWN SUFFERING (B) TO PERSONS (PROFESSIONALLY QUALIFIED OR NOT) PROVIDING PAID OR VOLUNTARY CARE TO ANY PERSON IN NEED OF PHYSIOTHERAPY (2) THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH AND THE DISSEMINATION TO THE PUBLIC AT LARGE OF THE RESULTS OF RESEARCH IN THE FIELD OF PHYSIOTHERAPY
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.