Dogfen lywodraethu Staffordshire Pathway Project
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 AUGUST 1991 AS AMENDED BY A SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS ON 4 SEPTEMBER 1991 AND 30 SEPTEMBER 2002. as amended on 14 Oct 2020 as amended on 30 Oct 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
3. The Object The Object (the Object) of the Charity shall be: 3.1 To relieve the physical, mental, emotional, social, financial and sexual distress among adults of all ages and/or their children, who have been maltreated or controlled by their partners, family members or persons with whom they were living or having a relationship with, or had made acquaintance of, specialising in gender-based abuse against women and girls.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED BUT IN PRACTICE WEST MIDLANDS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.