Dogfen lywodraethu Alabare
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23RD. APRIL 1991,AMENDED 14TH. AUGUST 1991 AND 29 APRIL 2004. as amended on 30 Jul 2020 as amended on 12 Sep 2020 as amended on 30 Jul 2020 as amended on 25 May 2023 as amended on 28 Mar 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY BY THE PROVISION OF SPECIAL ACCOMMODATION AND ANCILLARY SERVICES SUCH AS DAY CENTRES AND COUNSELLING FOR THOSE WHO BY REASON OF SOCIAL EMOTIONAL AND/OR PHYSICAL DISADVANTAGE (IMPAIRMENT) ARE IN NEED OF SUSTAINED SUPPORT TO ENABLE THEM TO LEAD LIVES WHICH PERMIT CHOICE AND DEVELOPMENT OF THEIR POTENTIAL AND AN ASSURED PLACE IN SOCIETY. 2. THE RELIEF AND PREVENTION OF SICKNESS DISEASE AND PHYSICAL OR MENTAL DISABILITY. 3. THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION.
Maes buddion
NATIONAL
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.