Dogfen lywodraethu LANGCLIFFE SINGERS

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 JULY 1988 AS AMENDED 11 FEBRUARY 2003, 28 FEBRUARY 2006, 19 FEBRUARY 2008, 8 SEPTEMBER 2009 AND 19 OCTOBER 2010. as amended on 14 Jan 2021 as amended on 12 Jan 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS. TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSE AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT BUT IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE MAKING OF GRANTS AND DONATIONS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.