Dogfen lywodraethu ROMSEY AGRICULTURAL AND HORSE SHOW SOCIETY

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 APRIL 1989 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 2 FEBRUARY 2005 AND 1 FEBRUARY 2006. AS AMENDED ON 07 FEB 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28 NOV 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(1)TO PROMOTE AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY, HORTICULTURE, ALLIED INDUSTRIES, RURAL CRAFTS, THE BREEDING OF LIVESTOCK INCLUDING HORSES, AND TO ENCOURAGE SKILL AND INDUSTRY IN SUCH ENTERPRISES. (2)TO HOLD IN PURSUANCE OF ITS MAIN OBJECTS AN ANNUAL AGRICULTURAL SHOW PROVIDED THAT THE SOCIETY SHALL NOT BE OBLIGED TO HOLD A SHOW IN ANY YEAR IN RELATION TO WHICH THE COUNCIL OF THE SOCIETY SHALL RESOLVE THAT THE HOLDING OF SUCH SHOW IS IMPRACTICABLE OR NOT IN THE INTERESTS OF THE SOCIETY.
Maes buddion
IN PRACTICE HAMPSHIRE AND NEIGHBOURING COUNTIES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.