Dogfen lywodraethu ALTERNATIVE FUTURES GROUP LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/01/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/09/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/06/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/09/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/06/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/02/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/04/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/04/2014 as amended on 18 Nov 2020 as amended on 09 Feb 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF ANY DISABILITY ARISING FROM ANY PHYSICAL OR MENTAL STATE, AGE, ACCIDENT OR AS A RESULT OF ANY DISEASE OR INFECTION OR WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES, MENTAL HEALTH AND ANY OTHER SPECIAL NEEDS, AND TO RELIEVE THE STRESSES AND FINANCIAL NEEDS EXPERIENCED BY THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS THROUGH, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION, SUPPORT AND EDUCATION AND TRAINING.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.