Dogfen lywodraethu THE SOCIETY FOR THE STUDY OF ADDICTION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27/02/1992 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 08/11/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 10/12/2012 as amended on 08 Nov 2018 as amended on 09 Nov 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (“OBJECTS”) ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ON MATTERS RELATING TO DEPENDENCE ON ALCOHOL AND DRUGS AND OTHER FORMS OF DEPENDENCE ASSOCIATED WITH COMPULSIVE BEHAVIOUR; AND THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM DEPENDENCE ON ALCOHOL AND DRUGS AND FROM OTHER FORMS OF DEPENDENCE ASSOCIATED WITH COMPULSIVE BEHAVIOUR.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.