Dogfen lywodraethu FITZROY SUPPORT
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/03/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/09/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/09/2006 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 21/02/2012 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 21/03/2013 as amended on 08 Nov 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The objects for which the Company is established are to promote in any manner which is charitable by law the benefit of people from all walks of life who have a learning or physical disability, autism or any similar disability to autism ,and/or mental health needs including (but without prejudice to the generality of the foregoing) the provision and rental of residential homes.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.