Dogfen lywodraethu Heruka Kadampa Meditation Centre

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21ST APRIL 1992, AS AMENDED 19TH SEPTEMBER 1994, 4TH JULY 1995 AND 2 FEBRUARY 2006 as amended on 01 Apr 2020 as amended on 15 Nov 2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE THE BUDDHIST FAITH UNDER THE SPIRITUAL GUIDANCE OF THE ELECTED GENERAL SPIRITUAL DIRECTOR OF THE NEW KADAMPA TRADITION - INTERNATIONAL KADAMPA BUDDHIST UNION PRINCIPALLY THROUGH THE ACTIVITIES OF TEACHING, STUDY, PRACTICE AND THE OBSERVANCE OF MORAL DISCIPLINE ALL WITHIN THE MAHAYANA BUDDHIST TRADITION OF ATISHA AND JE TSONGKHAPA AS TAUGHT BY VENERABLE GESHE KELSANG GYATSO, THE FOUNDER OF THE NEW KADAMPA TRADITION - INTERNATIONAL KADAMPA BUDDHIST UNION, THROUGH THE CONTINUOUS IMPLEMENTATION OF THE THREE NEW KADAMPA TRADITION STUDY PROGRAMMES: THE GENERAL PROGRAMME, THE FOUNDATION PROGRAMME, AND THE TEACHER TRAINING PROGRAMME, ALL AS DEFINED IN SCHEDULE A OF THE MEMORANDUM.
Maes buddion
LONDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.