Dogfen lywodraethu UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE (DACORUM)
Rhif yr elusen: 1012612
Up to date (76 days late)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15/03/1991 AS AMENDED ON 05/03/1992 AS AMENDED ON 12/05/2003 AS AMENDED ON 01/06/2012 AS AMENDED ON 04/08/2014 as amended on 02 Aug 2021 as amended on 06 Dec 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The advancement of education, and in particular the education of older people and those retired from full time work, by all means including associated activities conducive to learning and personal development in Dacorum and the surrounding area.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.