Dogfen lywodraethu ROYAL TRINITY HOSPICE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23/12/1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/08/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/10/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/10/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/09/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 07/09/2015
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) THE RECEPTION AND CARE OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM ANY DISEASE OR INJURY FROM WHICH DEATH MIGHT BE EXPECTED AT NO DISTANT DATE; (B) THE RECEPTION AND CARE OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM ANY CHRONIC OR CONTINUING DISEASE OR ACCIDENT, WHEREBY THEY MAY BE MADE AS COMFORTABLE AND ASSISTED TO LEAD AS FULL A LIFE AS POSSIBLE.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.