Dogfen lywodraethu CARE SOUTH
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4/12/90 AND AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED 30 SEPTEMBER 1992, 22 MARCH 1995, 26 MARCH 1997, 15 NOVEMBER 2002, 18 MAY 2005, 20 JULY 2005, 9 AUGUST 2006, 10 OCTOBER 2007 AND 26 MAY 2010. as amended on 29 Jul 2020 as amended on 29 Jul 2020 as amended on 29 Jul 2020 as amended on 11 Jul 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
2.1 The Company’s Objects are to: 2.1.1 promote the relief of and provide relief, support and assistance to individuals who by reason of old age, or physical or mental illness, or physical or learning disability, require special care and attention; 2.1.2 in particular, promote the relief of and provide support and assistance to, Beneficiaries who are resident in or associated with the south of England.
Maes buddion
SOUTH OF ENGLAND
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.