Dogfen lywodraethu THE INSTITUTE OF TRAFFIC ACCIDENT INVESTIGATORS

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06/10/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/05/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/09/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/03/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08 MAR 2017 as amended on 02 Dec 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE ROAD SAFETY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY A) IMPROVING THE TECHNICAL AND GENERAL SKILL AND KNOWLEDGE OF PERSONS ENGAGED IN OR INTENDING TO ENGAGE IN WORK OF TRAFFIC ACCIDENT INVESTGATORS OR ANY RELATED OCCUPATION CONCERNED WITH ROAD SAFETY B) IMPROVING THE STANDARDS OF SAFETY OF VEHICLES AND ROADS OF ALL KINDS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.