Dogfen lywodraethu NEW KADAMPA TRADITION - INTERNATIONAL KADAMPA BUDDHIST UNION

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 OCTOBER 1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 20 MARCH 1994, 15 AUGUST 1997, 6 AUGUST 2000, 11 AUGUST 2003, 31 JANUARY 2005, 3 AUGUST 2005 AND 15 APRIL 2007.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO INCREASE THE BUDDHIST FAITH THROUGHOUT THE WORLD UNDER THE SPIRITUAL GUIDANCE OF THE ELECTED GENERAL SPIRITUAL DIRECTOR OF THE NEW KADAMPA TRADITION - INTERNATIONAL KADAMPA BUDDHIST UNION BY PROMOTING THE ACTIVITIES OF THIS UNION OF KADAMPA BUDDHIST CENTRES
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.