KINGSLAND RESIDENTS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Kingsland Resisdemts association is responsible the Kingsland Community Centre. Situated on Winton Street, at the heart of Kingsland estate. The centre provides an affordable setting for numerous local groups and organisations. Activities in the centre range from Children's sessions, Sportimg clubs for older children as well as coffee mornings and bingo entertainment for our older residents.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 October 2020
Mae cyfanswm yr incwm yn cynnwys £10,000 o 1 grant(iau) llywodraeth
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Economaidd/datblygiad Cymunedol/cyfl Ogaeth
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Pobl O Dras Ethnig Neu Hiliol Arbennig
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Grwpiau Diffi Niedig Eraill
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Dinas Southampton
- Hampshire
Llywodraethu
- 08 Gorffennaf 2022: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 1130797 WEST ITCHEN COMMUNITY TRUST LIMITED
- 13 Tachwedd 1992: Cofrestrwyd
- 08 Gorffennaf 2022: Tynnwyd (CRONFEYDD WEDI'U TROSGLWYDDO (GI))
- Kingsland Community Centre (Enw gwaith)
- Trin cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Rheoli risg
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/10/2016 | 31/10/2017 | 31/10/2018 | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £8.59k | £10.70k | £7.70k | £7.68k | £13.86k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £10.07k | £9.22k | £5.13k | £5.70k | £8.06k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | £10.00k |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Hydref 2021 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Hydref 2021 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Hydref 2020 | 10 Mehefin 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Hydref 2020 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Hydref 2019 | 13 Mawrth 2020 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Hydref 2019 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Hydref 2018 | 26 Tachwedd 2019 | 87 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Hydref 2018 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19TH SEPTEMBER 1991
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A)TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF KINGSLAND AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (B)TO ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF, A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME(WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS.
Maes buddion
IN PRACTICE KINGSLAND, ST MARY'S, HOLYROOD, SOUTHAMPTON, HAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window