Dogfen lywodraethu SURF LIFE SAVING GREAT BRITAIN

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/01/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/02/2007 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 03/07/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/04/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 31/12/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 26 AUG 2017 as amended on 30 Nov 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECT FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED IS TO SAVE LIVES ON BRITAIN'S BEACHES AND TO ENGAGE IN SEARCH AND RESCUE ACTIVITIES AND TO PROVIDE EDUCATION IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO LIFESAVING, SEARCH AND RESCUE AND RESUSCITATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.