Dogfen lywodraethu DORE VILLAGE SOCIETY

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30/11/2000 AS AMENDED ON 22/06/2005 AS AMENDED ON 24/05/2006 AS AMENDED ON 09/06/2010 AS AMENDED ON 23/05/2012 AS AMENDED ON 24/04/2013 AS AMENDED ON 27/01/2014 AS AMENDED ON 07 JUN 2017 as amended on 12 Jun 2019 as amended on 13 Jan 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1)TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING OR ARCHITECTURE IN OR AFFECTING THE AREA OF BENEFIT. 2)TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE GEOGRAPHY, HISTORY, NATURAL HISTORY AND ARCHITECTURE OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT. 3)TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. 4)TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND ACTIVITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Maes buddion
DORE, SHEFFIELD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.