Dogfen lywodraethu FOREVER MANCHESTER
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/01/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/10/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/05/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/05/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/03/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 11/03/2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(1) THE PROMOTION OF ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE COUNTY OF GREATER MANCHESTER AND IN PARTICULAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION,THE PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY,DISTRESS AND SICKNESS AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE (2) SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS ARE OR MAY BE BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY IN THE COUNTY OF GREATER MANCHESTER
Maes buddion
GREATER MANCHESTER
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.