Dogfen lywodraethu BRITISH TUNNELLING SOCIETY
Rhif yr elusen: 1017887

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen yn hwyr o 204 diwrnod
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 SEPTEMBER 1971 AS AMENDED 21 OCTOBER 1976 18 OCTOBER 1990, 21 JANUARY 1993, 16TH MAY 2002 AND 19TH MAY 2005
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN AND TO PROMOTE THE ART AND SCIENCE OF TUNNELLING,INCLUDING THE CREATION AND USE OF UNDERGROUND SPACE BY FOSTERING UNDERSTANDING, EXPERIENCE, INTEREST AND RESEARCH THEREIN
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.