RELATE WALSALL
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Provides a Counselling Service for people with Relationship Challenges, whether attending as individuals, couples or families (which may include siblings). Provides support in the event of relationship breakdown and or separation/divorce, through the medium of counselling. Provides educational workshops, talks and life skills training in relation to relationship issues, when resourced to do so.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2012
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Hybu Iechyd Neu’r Achub O Fywydau
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Walsall
Llywodraethu
- 09 Mawrth 1993: Cofrestrwyd
- 22 Ionawr 2015: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
- RELATE WALSALL - WALSALL RELATE (Enw gwaith)
- RELATE WALSALL MARRIAGE GUIDANCE (Enw blaenorol)
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £36.14k | £68.55k | £58.94k | £51.33k | £78.89k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £45.77k | £50.75k | £68.48k | £69.71k | £70.35k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2014 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2014 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2013 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2013 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2012 | 29 Ionawr 2013 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2012 | 30 Ionawr 2013 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2011 | 23 Tachwedd 2011 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2011 | 16 Ionawr 2012 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 JANUARY 1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 22 JANUARY 2004 AND 25 SEPTEMBER 2008
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(1) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC CONCERNING THE BENEFITS OF SECURE COUPLE RELATIONSHIPS, MARRIAGE AND FAMILY LIFE IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THE EMOTIONAL, SEXUAL AND SPIRITUAL WELL-BEING OF INDIVIDUALS WHICH IS DERIVED FROM COMMITTED RELATIONSHIPS (2) TO SEEK TO ENHANCE THE GOOD HEALTH, BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL, OF ADULTS AND CHILDREN BY: (1) INCREASING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE BENEFIT OF COMMITTED COUPLE RELATIONSHIPS, MARRIAGE AND FAMILY LIFE; AND (2) WORKING TO PREVENT POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS CAUSED BY THE BREAKDOWN OF SUCH RELATIONSHIPS (3) TO PROVIDE COUNSELLING, ADVICE, EDUCATION, GUIDANCE AND RELIEF TO ADULTS AND/OR CHILDREN IN RELATION TO ANY ASPECT OF CONTEMPORARY LIFE OR WORK WHICH: (1) MAY PREJUDICE THEIR PHYSICAL OR MENTAL WELL-BEING; OR (2) INFLUENCE, EITHER DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY, THEIR PRESENT OR FUTURE FAMILY OR COUPLE RELATIONSHIP (4) TO ADVANCE CITIZENSHIP AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT (5) TO RELIEVE THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE; AND (6) TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO ALL OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS AND TO MAKE THE RESULTS AVAILABLE TO THE PUBLIC
Maes buddion
WALSALL METROPOLITAN BOROUGH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window