Dogfen lywodraethu SAFER PLACES
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12/02/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/01/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/01/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 11/05/2010 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 24/01/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 26/09/2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO RELIEVE DISTRESS AND SUFFERING AMONGST PEOPLE LIVING WITH OR FLEEING FROM OR AT RISK OF DOMESTIC ABUSE INCLUDING STALKING AND HARASSMENT; TO PROVIDE EDUCATION FOR THEIR FUTURE BENEFIT; TO EDUCATE THOSE WHO WORK WITH VICTIMS OF DOMESTIC VIOLENCE AND TO PROVIDE SOCIAL HOUSING FOR THOSE SUFFERING, FLEEING, OR AT RISK OF DOMESTIC VIOLENCE, STALKING AND HARASSMENT.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.