Dogfen lywodraethu Island Concerns

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 31ST JANUARY 1992, AMENDED 13 APRIL 1992, AND 20 MARCH 1993 as amended on 01 Nov 2022 as amended on 06 Aug 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(1) To promote, improve, develop and maintain public education in and appreciation of the art and science of music by the presentation of public concerts and recitals and by such other ways as the company through its director and trustees shall determine from time to time. (2) To provide benefit to Cowes and Isle of Wight organisations with charitable status, clubs and organisations individuals and projects for specific purposes with charitable aims or benefit to Cowes and the Isle of Wight. This may include youth development, the sport of sailing for which Cowes is well known, services to the community, and local environmental sectors.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.