Dogfen lywodraethu Care Rights UK: your care champion

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 31 MAR 1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21 DEC 1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25 NOV 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22 NOV 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26 FEB 2016 as amended on 15 May 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(I)TO ALLEVIATE DISTRESS AND SUFFERING AMONGST ELDERLY PEOPLE BY ANY MEANS CONSIDERED NECESSARY FROM TIME TO TIME AND DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE. (II)TO ALLEVIATE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE AMONG PEOPLE(INCLUDING RELATIVES) WHO ARE CARING OR WHO HAVE CARED FOR ELDERLY PEOPLE AND WHO ARE IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES, AND OF THE DEPENDENTS OF SUCH CARERS BEING DEPENDENTS WHO ARE THEMSELVES IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES, AND FOR THAT REASON TO PROMOTE THE MATERIAL WELFARE OF SUCH CARERS AS AFORESAID. (III)TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND COUNSELLING AND THE DISSEMINATION OF INFORMATION TO ELDERLY PEOPLE AND TO PERSONS(INCLUDING RELATIVES) CARING FOR OR HAVING CARERS FOR ELDERLY PEOPLE. (IV)TO ASSIST IN ACHIEVING AND MAINTAINING THE HIGHEST POSSIBLE STANDARDS OF CARE FOR ELDERLY PEOPLE RESIDENT IN RESIDENTIAL CARE HOMES, NURSING HOMES, HOMES WITH DUAL REGISTRATION, LONG STAY HOSPITALS OR OTHER HOMES FOR THE CARE OF ELDERLY PEOPLE.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.