Dogfen lywodraethu ROCHDALE & DISTRICT SCOPE
Rhif yr elusen: 1020427

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 08/10/1983 AS AMENDED ON 08/03/1993 AS AMENDED ON 24/06/1996 AS AMENDED ON 19/06/2000 AS AMENDED ON 15/10/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROVIDE,CAUSE TO BE PROVIDED,OR ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE TREATMENT,EDUCATION AND WELFARE OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM ANY FORM OF CEREBRAL PALSY
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED-IN PRACTICE ROCHDALE AND DISTRICT
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.