Dogfen lywodraethu SPS DORCHESTER 2023 LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19/05/1993 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 10/07/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/05/2013 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 15/05/2013 as amended on 24 Mar 2022 as amended on 09 Feb 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND IN CONNECTION THEREWITH TO ACQUIRE, DEVELOP, CONDUCT AND CARRY ON IN THE UNITED KINGDOM ANY DAY OR BOARDING SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS FOR THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BETWEEN THE AGES OF 3 MONTHS AND 16 AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING TO ACQUIRE, DEVELOP, CONDUCT AND CARRY ON EDUCATION AT SUNNINGHILL PREPARATORY SCHOOL LIMITED FOR THE EDUCATION OF THE CHILDREN ATTENDING IT
Maes buddion
IN PRACTICE, DORSET
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.