Dogfen lywodraethu BATH AND DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 AUGUST 1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ADOPTED ON 12 NOVEMBER 2002, 9 NOVEMBER 2004 AND BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20 OCTOBER 2010. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14 NOV 2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN BATH AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Maes buddion
BATH AND SURROUNDINGS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.