Dogfen lywodraethu PETERBOROUGH UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 MAY 1993 AS AMENDED 27 JANUARY 2005 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018 AS AMENDED ON 16 JAN 2021 AS AMENDED ON 28 OCT 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY'S OBJECT IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, AND IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE RETIRED FROM FULL-TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR THOSE LIVING IN THE CITY OF PETERBOROUGH AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.