HILLTOP PRESCHOOL
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Hilltop is community based pre-school, running for over 50 years. We are affiliated to the Pre-School Learning Alliance and work towards the Early Learning Goals, which form part of the Early Years Foundation Stage. Hilltop Pre-school is held in large church hall with garden and caters from 2.5 years to 5 years. Up to 30 children in each session. Running 6 sessions per week.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 August 2022
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Darparu Adnoddau Dynol
- Essex
Llywodraethu
- 22 Rhagfyr 2021: y derbyniwyd cronfeydd gan 1034872 RAYLEIGH METHODIST PRE-SCHOOL
- 11 Hydref 1993: Cofrestrwyd
- 19 Mehefin 2024: Tynnwyd (NID YW'N GWEITHREDU)
- HILLTOP PLAYGROUP (Enw blaenorol)
- Trin cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Buddsoddi
- Talu staff
- Rheoli risg
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £82.72k | £74.11k | £70.56k | £73.11k | £95.59k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £69.86k | £71.89k | £78.51k | £82.86k | £103.54k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2023 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2023 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2022 | 26 Mehefin 2023 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2022 | 26 Mehefin 2023 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2021 | 29 Mehefin 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2021 | 29 Mehefin 2022 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2020 | 21 Mehefin 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2020 | 21 Mehefin 2021 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2019 | 29 Mehefin 2020 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2019 | 29 Mehefin 2020 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15/04/1991 AS AMENDED ON 21/10/2013 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 01 MAR 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL ARE TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: (A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES, FAMILY LEARNING AND EXTENDED HOURS GROUPS, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY; (B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS; (C) INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE RAYLEIGH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window