Dogfen lywodraethu THE OXFORD DOWN SHEEP BREEDERS' ASSOCIATION
Rhif yr elusen: 1029168

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 MAY 1889 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 19 FEBRUARY 1970, 10 SEPTEMBER 1992, 9 SEPTEMBER 1993 AND 14 AUGUST 2010 as amended on 17 Aug 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE BREEDING OF OXFORD DOWN SHEEP AT HOME AND ABROAD AND THE MAINTENANCE OF THE PURITY OF THE BREED FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY AT LARGE.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.