Dogfen lywodraethu PARENTS TEACHERS AND FRIENDS OF FIVE WAYS
Rhif yr elusen: 1030888

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 MAY 1993 AS AMENDED ON 9 NOVEMBER 1993, 13TH SEPTEMBER 1994, 2ND OCTOBER 1995, 24 SEPTEMBER 2002 AND 23 SEPTEMBER 2003 AS AMENDED ON 04 OCT 2016 as amended on 18 Nov 2020 as amended on 12 Oct 2022 as amended on 03 Oct 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.