Dogfen lywodraethu Friends of Wigton Infant School

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 JANUARY 1991 AS AMENDED ON 13 OCTOBER 1993 as amended on 15 Nov 2017 as amended on 07 Oct 2020 as amended on 05 Nov 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The object of the association is to advance the education of the pupils in the school by: -developing effective relationships between the staff, parents and others associated with the school -engaging in activities or providing facilities or equipment which support the school and advance the education of the pupils.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.