Dogfen lywodraethu Via Community Ltd

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02/04/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/10/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/07/2010 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 10/01/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/09/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18/02/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/08/2015 as amended on 05 Jun 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF SUFFERING OF PERSONS AFFECTED BY SUBSTANCE MISUSE AND OTHER ADDICTIVE DISORDERS, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, ADVICE, COUNSELLING, TREATMENT AND REHABILITATION SERVICES TO SUCH PERSONS, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.